U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morsette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 15, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.