U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Demontiney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 22, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • September 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 28, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.