U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:05-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.