U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Bautista v. City of Havre et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 11, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 11, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.