U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Love v. Tytus et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.