U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Brodowy et al v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • June 29, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 11, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.