U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buchholz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 14, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.