U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Kimling v. M.S.P. Infirmary, part of D.O.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.