U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 18, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 18, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.