U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Boyer v. Target Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 20, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 06, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • July 05, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • May 13, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.