U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Lopez v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 03, 2023: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2022: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.