U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-bk-40029-
  • Case Name: RONDA RAE DRUELL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 15, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • January 07, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Approving]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Delay Discharge]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Delay Discharge]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice for Financial Management Course Certificate]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 13]
May, 2022
  • May 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • May 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.