U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Pines v. Linder et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 24, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.