U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shideler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 19, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Order - MT]
  • September 05, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • July 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 10, 2022: [Quash ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • June 10, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 10, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Compel ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.