U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Atkinson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Vacate]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Pro Se Registration Form]
  • May 25, 2022: [Consent to Electronic Service]
  • May 16, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.