U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Forest Service et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • September 27, 2024: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • January 12, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Statement - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Case Management Order - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • November 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • November 09, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Modify - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Modify - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • August 29, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 25, 2022: [Intervene]
  • August 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 25, 2022: [Case Management Order - MT]
  • July 22, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 17, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 17, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.