U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Meidinger et al v. Starstone U.S. Intermediaries, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • October 17, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 30, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 15, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 17, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.