U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Doe No. 1 v. Billings School District No. 2
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • October 17, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 29, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Change Venue]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.