U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-bk-90078-
  • Case Name: DONNA E ENO
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 04, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 02, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice for Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Stay - BK]
June, 2022
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Motion Compelling Turnover of Documents to the U.S. Trustee/Trustee]
  • June 10, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Terminate original trustee and appoint new trustee]
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion Compelling Turnover of Documents to the U.S. Trustee/Trustee]
  • June 03, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • June 01, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.