U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00048
  • Case Name: R Journey LLC et al v. Kampgrounds of America, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2022: [Remark]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 31, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 24, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 02, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 02, 2022: [Counterclaim]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Remark]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 17, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.