U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Laughery et al v. New Sound Transportation, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 17, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.