U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Chadwell v. Ofc. Stull
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 23, 2022: [USM 285 Return Unexecuted - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 12, 2022: [USM 285 Return Unexecuted - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 15, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.