U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Doe No. 1 v. Roy School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 18, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.