U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Freedom Specialty Insurance Company v. Logan Health
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 08, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Serve - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to Serve - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 19, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 19, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.