U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Collins v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 19, 2022: [Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.