U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nichols
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.