U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Not Afraid
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Release Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 26, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 15, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Vacate]
  • July 12, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 12, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • July 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 26, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.