U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Seyler v. Briney et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Create Case Association]
  • May 20, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 20, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.