U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gardipee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • January 09, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.