U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sims
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • September 21, 2022: [Appear]
  • September 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.