U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Archer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
  • April 14, 2025: [Remark - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.