U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bentley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 26, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 25, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 24, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 03, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 23, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.