U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Nickerson v. Gootkin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Set Aside Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 22, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 30, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 27, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.