U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Youpee v. Cantrell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Mail Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.