U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kron
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 20, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 28, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.