U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sutherland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • May 23, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.