U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hanson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 24, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 24, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.