U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-bk-40035-
  • Case Name: EAGLE BEAR INC.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Administrative Closure (Case Dismissed)]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Recuse Judge - BK]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Interim Fees]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Interim Fees]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Terminated - Text Only]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Interim Fees]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • October 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • October 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • October 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • October 11, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • October 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • October 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Pay ]
  • October 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period]
  • October 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • September 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • August 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
July, 2022
  • July 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • July 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Transmittal Memorandum re Motion for Withdrawal of Reference]
  • July 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • July 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reply re Motion for Withdrawal of Reference]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • June 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response to Motion for Withdrawal of Reference]
  • June 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Reply re Motion for Withdrawal of Reference]
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Assume/Reject Lease]
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • June 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Withdrawal of Reference]
  • June 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 04, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • June 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approving Stipulation]
  • June 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
  • June 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • May 31, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • May 31, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay Under 11 USC 362(k)]
  • May 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion/Request for Judicial Notice]
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Response to Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Entered in Error - BK]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice - BK]
  • May 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Expedite Hearing - BK]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion - BK]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.