U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Smith v. Caring for Montanans, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Dismissing Parties - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Stay Discovery - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 25, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.