U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00036
  • Case Name: Katmai Water Taxi v. Hoffart et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 09, 2022: [Stay]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • August 16, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 23, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 23, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.