U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00036
  • Case Name: Bishop v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Remark]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Administrative Record]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 23, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 23, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.