U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Nelson v. Forest River, INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 31, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 28, 2025: [Strike - SDM]
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 25, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 19, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 11, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
December, 2024
  • December 15, 2024: [Transcript - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Strike - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 15, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 04, 2022: [Strike - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 04, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 05, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Approve Consent Judgment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to Serve - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 18, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Status Report]
  • August 18, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 24, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 24, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.