U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-mj-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 31, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • May 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 24, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.