U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BAILEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.