U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huseby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • January 20, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2023: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • January 20, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 20, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 19, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Order - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.