U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loring
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 09, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Vacate]
  • August 17, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Quash ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Revoke]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.