U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goodbird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • July 15, 2022: [Revoke]
  • July 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.