U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aaron Ramirez Espinoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • December 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Exhibits - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • August 17, 2022: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Witness List - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Jury List ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • August 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • August 10, 2022: [Remark - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Stipulation - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 09, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Proceed to Trial - MT]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.