U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burshia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.