U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Birdsbill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 05, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.